KY HB37 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to require schools to offer all students instruction in the visual and performing arts, submit an annual report to the Department of Education, and implement school policies regarding visual and performing arts instruction; require the Department of Education to develop visual and performing arts program standards, guidelines on model programs, and strategies and initiatives for meeting the requirements of the section; require the Department of Education to provide resources, assessment tools, and a reporting checklist to schools; require the Department of Education to report to the Interim Joint Committee on Education by December 1, 2021, on the status of schools meeting the requirements of this section; amend KRS 158.6453 to require the school profile report to be included in the school report card and require the visual and performing arts program data to be included in the school profile report; amend KRS 160.345 and 158.153 to conform; cite the Act as the Arts Education Equity Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to arts education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 110 (Y: 73 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18Senateto Education (S)
2020-02-14Senatereceived in Senate
2020-02-13House3rd reading, passed 73-16 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1)
2020-02-07Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-01-30Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, January 31, 2020
2020-01-29House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-01-28Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-01-21Houseposted in committee
2020-01-07Houseto Education (H)
2020-01-07Houseintroduced in House
2019-08-20HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback