KY HB368 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - recommitted to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 164.7874 to delete the requirement that an eligible high school student and eligible postsecondary student not be a convicted felon for KEES eligibility purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Educational Excellence Scholarship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 200 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15Senaterecommitted to Education (S)
2020-03-26Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-19Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2020-03-12Senateto Education (S)
2020-03-10Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-09House3rd reading, passed 90-0
2020-03-05Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 6, 2020
2020-03-04House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-03Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-02-21Houseposted in committee
2020-02-05Houseto Education (H)
2020-02-03Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback