KY HB366 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 66)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 164.380 to establish guidelines for the operation and management of the model and practice schools operated by Eastern Kentucky University; require the board of regents to adopt policies for the operation of the model and practice school; ensure model and practice schools and students eligible for state programs; establish a model and practice school advisory council; provide that for the purposes of determining equalization and local effort the model and practice school students shall be included in the residing district's average daily attendance; amend KRS 164.7874 and KRS 164.7885 to conform; repeal KRS 156.472, relating to textbooks for model and practice school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to Eastern Kentucky University's model and practice school.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1378 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 176 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27Housesigned by Governor (Acts ch. 66)
2020-03-19Housedelivered to Governor
2020-03-19Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-03-19Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-03-19Housereceived in House
2020-03-18Senate3rd reading, passed 31-0
2020-03-18Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 18, 2020
2020-03-17Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-12Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-03-10Senateto Education (S)
2020-03-05Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-04House3rd reading, passed 95-0
2020-02-27Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 28, 2020
2020-02-26House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-25Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-02-13Houseposted in committee
2020-02-05Houseto Education (H)
2020-02-03Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback