KY HB362 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-14 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 170)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 requiring schools to offer the Armed Services Vocational Aptitude Battery (ASVAB) test annually to students in grades 10 through 12, offer counseling based on the ASVAB test results, and allow up to four excused absences to meet with a recruiter of the Armed Forces of the United States or Kentucky National Guard; amend KRS 159.035 to allow excused absences for students who meet with a military recruiter, receive ASVAB counseling, or pursue enlistment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to high school students pursuing military careers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-13 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 474 (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 714 (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 460 (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SCTA 1 RSN# 692 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 217 (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-14Senatedelivered to Secretary of State (Acts, ch. 170)
2018-04-13Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-13Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-13Senatereceived in House
2018-04-13HouseBill passed 34-4
2018-04-13Houseveto overridden
2018-04-13Houseposted for consideration of Governor's veto
2018-04-13Houseto Rules (S)
2018-04-13Housereceived in Senate
2018-04-13SenateBill passed 94-2
2018-04-13Senateveto overridden
2018-04-13Senateposted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto
2018-04-13Senatetaken from Rules
2018-04-13Senateto Rules (H)
2018-04-13Senatereceived in House
2018-04-05Housevetoed
2018-04-02Housedelivered to Governor
2018-04-02Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-02Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-02HouseBill passed 90-2
2018-04-02HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2018-04-02Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2018-04-02Housetaken from Rules
2018-04-02Houseto Rules (H)
2018-04-02Housereceived in House
2018-04-02Senate3rd reading, passed 35-3 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2018-04-02Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, April 2, 2018
2018-04-02Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2018-04-02Senaterecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2018-04-02Senatetaken from Rules (H)
2018-03-16Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-15Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-03-06Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2018-03-05Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-02House3rd reading, passed 81-1
2018-03-01Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 2, 2018
2018-03-01House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-28Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-02-20Houseposted in committee
2018-02-15Houseto Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H)
2018-02-13Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback