KY HB362 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 246.650 to define "Ginseng" and delete the definition of "Cultivated ginseng"; amend KRS 246.660 to prohibit information relating to the purchase or sale of ginseng from being subject to public disclosure; to require the department to establish licensing requirements for ginseng dealers; to require the department to promulgate administrative regulations establishing administrative violations and civil penalties relating to ginseng; create a new section of KRS 246.650 to 246.660 to establish a Kentucky ginseng fund; amend KRS 246.990 to establish penalties and establish a mechanism for the seizing of ginseng.
Title
AN ACT relating to ginseng.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | signed by Governor | |
2011-02-28 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-02-28 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2011-02-28 | received in House | |
2011-02-28 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 | |
2011-02-28 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 28, 2011 | |
2011-02-25 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-24 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | to Agriculture (S) | |
2011-02-18 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-18 | 3rd reading, passed 95-1 | |
2011-02-17 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 18, 2011 | |
2011-02-17 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-16 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-14 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-08 | to Agriculture & Small Business (H) | |
2011-02-07 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB362.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB362/bill.doc |