KY HB358 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 75)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 75)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 36 to authorize the adjutant general to establish morale, welfare, and recreation facilities on Department of Military Affairs property, for use by current and former members of the Kentucky National Guard, their dependents, and civilian employees of the United States or this state working under the department's management or in support of department activities; provide that operation of program will be funded with private donations and without appropriations from the state or federal government; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to military affairs and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 75) |
2015-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-1 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-10 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2015 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | 1st reading |
2015-03-03 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-0 |
2015-02-26 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-23 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-10 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2015-02-09 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB358.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB358/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB358/vote_history.pdf |