KY HB357 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - received in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 311A.142 to require reciprocity of certification or licensure for any member of the United States military who is registered by the National Registry of Emergency Medical Technicians as an emergency medical responder, emergency medical technician, advanced emergency medical technician, or paramedic; grant reciprocity to any emergency medical responder, emergency medical technician, advanced emergency medical technician, or paramedic that is currently certified or licensed and is in good standing with a state contiguous to Kentucky.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to emergency medical services professions reciprocity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 120 (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 119 (Y: 26 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19Senatereceived in Senate
2020-02-18Housepassed 90-2
2020-02-18Housefloor amendment (1) defeated
2020-02-18House3rd reading
2020-02-14Housefloor amendment (1) filed
2020-02-13Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 14, 2020
2020-02-13House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-12Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-02-06Houseposted in committee
2020-02-03Houseto Local Government (H)
2020-01-30Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback