KY HB355 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 84)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 84)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
The Legislative Branch Budget: appropriate from the General Fund $73,936,000 for fiscal year 2020-2021 and $75,938,700 for fiscal year 2021-2022; appropriate from Restricted Funds $75,000 for fiscal year 2020-2021 and $175,000 for fiscal year 2021-2022, with appropriations allocated as follows:
Title
AN ACT making appropriations for the operations, maintenance, and support of the Legislative Branch of the Commonwealth of Kentucky.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 334 (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1425 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 194 (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1425 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 194 (Y: 84 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-13 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 84) |
2020-04-01 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-04-01 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-04-01 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-04-01 | House | passed 86-4 |
2020-04-01 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-04-01 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-04-01 | House | taken from Rules |
2020-04-01 | House | to Rules (H) |
2020-04-01 | House | received in House |
2020-04-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-04-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, April 1, 2020 |
2020-04-01 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2020-03-18 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | 1st reading |
2020-03-17 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-06 | House | 3rd reading, passed 84-3 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-05 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-05 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-03 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-03-03 | House | 1st reading |
2020-03-03 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-02-05 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-29 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-01-28 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget and Financial Administration
General Assembly
Legislative Research Commission
State Agencies
Budget and Financial Administration
General Assembly
Legislative Research Commission
State Agencies