KY HB354 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch.94)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch.94)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Set out the 2020-2022 Biennial Highway Construction Plan; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to road projects and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1453 (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 373 (Y: 59 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 330 (Y: 77 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1426 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 252 (Y: 72 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - House - House: Veto Override RCS# 373 (Y: 59 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 330 (Y: 77 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1426 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 252 (Y: 72 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | Senate | delivered to Secretary of State (Acts Ch.94) |
2020-04-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-04-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-04-15 | Senate | received in House |
2020-04-15 | House | bill passed 28-6 |
2020-04-15 | House | veto overridden in Senate |
2020-04-15 | House | posted for consideration of Governor's veto |
2020-04-15 | House | to Rules (S) |
2020-04-15 | House | received in Senate |
2020-04-15 | Senate | bill passed 59-31 |
2020-04-15 | Senate | veto overridden in House |
2020-04-15 | Senate | posted for passage for consideration of Governor's veto |
2020-04-15 | Senate | taken from Rules |
2020-04-14 | Senate | to Rules (H) |
2020-04-14 | Senate | veto message received in House |
2020-04-13 | House | line items vetoed |
2020-04-01 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-04-01 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-04-01 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-04-01 | House | passed 77-12 |
2020-04-01 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-04-01 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-04-01 | House | taken from Rules |
2020-04-01 | House | to Rules (H) |
2020-04-01 | House | received in House |
2020-04-01 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-04-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, April 1, 2020 |
2020-04-01 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-26 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2020-03-26 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2020-03-26 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | 1st reading |
2020-03-19 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2020-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-03-18 | House | 3rd reading, passed 72-12-1 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-17 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-17 | House | taken from Rules |
2020-03-17 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-12 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-03-12 | House | 1st reading |
2020-03-12 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-02-05 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-31 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2020-01-30 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Budget and Financial Administration
Effective Dates, Emergency
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
State Agencies
Transportation
Effective Dates, Emergency
Highways, Streets, and Bridges
State Agencies
Transportation