KY HB354 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-02 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 277.200 to prohibit a railroad company from stopping trains on the tracks and obstructing a private road that serves as the only entrance to a residence; amend KRS 277.990 to set fine for violation of KRS 277.200 at between $500 and $5,000.
Title
AN ACT relating to railroads.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 3, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2017-03-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-28 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2017-02-16 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-15 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2017-02-14 | House | introduced in House |