KY HB354 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on April 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-05 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 126)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on April 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-05 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 126)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to require adoption of a school emergency plan; require emergency drills; require an annual report to the department of education; amend KRS 158.163 to require safety drills within the first month of school; amend KRS 158.164 to require a lockdown practice within the first month of school; create new sections of KRS Chapter 158 to require local boards to review crime prevention designs when constructing or renovating a school building, provide law enforcement, fire, and medical personnel with copies of school emergency response plans and floor plans, and develop facility floor plans emergency identification numbers for windows and doors; require the Kentucky Department of Education to develop protocols for student records within the student information system which provides schools receiving the records an awareness of prior offenses described in KRS 610.345; amend KRS 158.160 to include notification to the school of students with mental or emotional conditions; create a new section of KRS Chapter 156 to require the Kentucky Department of Education and the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to establish procedures to assist school personnel in recognizing and obtaining assistance for students with mental or emotional conditions; create new sections of KRS Chapters 70 and 95 to encourage chiefs of police and sheriffs to receive training on issues pertaining to school and student safety; amend KRS 61.878 to exempt school and school facility emergency plans from public viewing as open records; amend KRS 157.420 to include costs related to school and student safety; amend KRS 157.623 to include facilities determined unsafe by a local police chief or county sheriff; amend KRS 158.446 to include school resource officers; amend KRS 158.445 to include emergency response plans as part of a school's end-of-year annual review; amend KRS 160.345 to include the adoption of an emergency response plan as part of a school council's duties; amend various other sections of the Kentucky Revised Statutes to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to school safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-05 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 126) |
2013-03-26 | House | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-26 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-26 | House | passed 98-0 |
2013-03-26 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2013-03-26 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2013-03-26 | House | to Rules (H) |
2013-03-26 | House | received in House |
2013-03-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute |
2013-03-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2013 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2013-03-04 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute, floor amendments (1) (2) and (3) |
2013-02-22 | House | floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2013-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2013 |
2013-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-21 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2013-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2013-02-20 | House | posting waived |
2013-02-20 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-13 | House | to Education (H) |
2013-02-12 | House | introduced in House |