KY HB353 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 132.485 to exempt for the January 1, 2022, January 1, 2023, and January 1, 2024, assessment dates, the portion of property taxes computed on any increase in a motor vehicle's valuation from January 1, 2021; RETROACTIVE; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the assessment of motor vehicles for property tax purposes and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Myron Dossett [R] | Rep. Adam Bowling [R] | Rep. Ryan Dotson [R] | Rep. Deanna Frazier Gordon [R] |
Rep. Norma Kirk-McCormick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-25 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Effective Dates, Emergency
Local Mandate
Motor Vehicles
Retroactive Legislation
Taxation
Taxation, Property
Local Mandate
Motor Vehicles
Retroactive Legislation
Taxation
Taxation, Property