KY HB351 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - became law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 178)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 160.158 to direct the Kentucky Community Education Association and the commissioner of education or his or her designee to work jointly to create a list of 3 nominees to fill any vacancy on the Advisory Council for Community Education; provide that the council shall schedule all meetings after the first meeting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to community education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1048 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 245 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27Housebecame law without Governor's Signature (KY Acts ch. 178)
2019-03-26Housefiled without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Housereceived in House
2019-03-14Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2019-03-14Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 14, 2019
2019-03-13Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-12Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-03-07Senateto Education (S)
2019-03-07Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-06House3rd reading, passed 98-0
2019-03-05Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 6, 2019
2019-03-05Housereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill
2019-03-04Housereturned to Education (H)
2019-03-04House1st reading
2019-03-04Housetaken from Education (H)
2019-03-01Houseposted in committee
2019-02-14Houseto Education (H)
2019-02-13Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback