KY HB351 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 104)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 104)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.522 to remove installments as a payment option for agencies required to pay the actuarial costs for ceasing participation in the Kentucky Retirement Systems; clarify conditions in which an employee seeking to transfer funds to the ceasing employer's alternative retirement program is not included in the employer actuarial cost calculation; specify that the systems shall develop separate assumptions for determining the employer's cost to cease participation; specify the formula for determining the assumed rate of return in the cost calculation; provide noncodified language to state the provisions shall apply retroactively to any matter pending before the Kentucky Retirement Systems board; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to Kentucky Retirement Systems agency participation and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 104) |
2017-03-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-15 | House | received in House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0-1 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 15, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2017-03-14 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-03-14 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-03 | House | 3rd reading, passed 64-18 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1) |
2017-03-01 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 2, 2017 |
2017-02-27 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2017-02-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2017-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-21 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-15 | House | to State Government (H) |
2017-02-14 | House | introduced in House |