KY HB349 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 124)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 124)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 11.202, 304.13-340, 304.50-160, 341.240, 342.035, 342.1223, 342.230, 342.342, 342.765, and 342.817 to change the name of the committee of the General Assembly which shall receive agency reports.
Title
AN ACT relating to legislative committees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1763 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 92 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 92 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 124) |
2021-03-16 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-16 | House | received in House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2021-03-12 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2021-03-05 | Senate | returned to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-03-05 | Senate | taken from Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, & Labor (S) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-23 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 |
2021-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 23, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-04 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-04 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2021-02-03 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-03 | House | introduced in House |