KY HB347 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 2 to designate the second Wednesday in February as "Family Resource and Youth Services Center Day."
Title
AN ACT designating the second Wednesday in February as Family Resource and Youth Services Center Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 147 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-02-17 | House | 3rd reading, passed 92-0 |
2022-02-16 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 17, 2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-28 | House | to Education (H) |
2022-01-24 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-24 | House | introduced in House |