KY HB344 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 20)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 20)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 218A.240 to add permission for the Cabinet for Health and Family Services or applicable licensing board to access KASPER data to notify patients of a practitioner's emergency closure; amend KRS 218A.245 to delete reporting requirement on reciprocal interstate agreements for prescription drug monitoring program data exchanges.
Title
AN ACT relating to Kentucky All Schedule Prescription Electronic Reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1299 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 103 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 103 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 20) |
2020-03-11 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-10 | House | received in House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2020-02-18 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 |
2020-02-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 11, 2020 |
2020-02-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-02-04 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-30 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2020-01-28 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Drugs and Medicines
Health and Medical Services
Nurses
Opioids
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners
State Agencies
Health and Medical Services
Nurses
Opioids
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners
State Agencies