KY HB343 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - to Education (S)
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 159.150 to specify that students in kindergarten can be truant.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to school truancy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 172 (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04Senateto Education (S)
2019-03-01Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-28House3rd reading, passed 86-13
2019-02-27Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2019
2019-02-27House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-26Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-22Houseposted in committee
2019-02-14Houseto Education (H)
2019-02-13Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback