KY HB343 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 117)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 117)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 75.010 to delineate the territory that may be encompassed during the creation of a fire protection district or volunteer fire department district; amend KRS 75.020, relating to the enlargement or diminishment of fire district boundaries and merger, to require agreements to be entered into when a fire district wishes to expand territory into an area outside the boundaries of a city that is providing fire service to that area; prohibit expansion of one fire district into the territory of another fire district; ensure that boundary maps are filed and updated pursuant to law when boundaries are modified; amend KRS 75.022, relating to fire service boundaries, to establish when a city not having a regular fire department may assume fire protection services of annexed territories; amend KRS 273.401, relating to nonprofit corporations, to require written approval of the governing body of the city or district before a nonprofit fire department can add subscriber fees or charges to territory within a city or within the boundaries of a KRS Chapter 75 fire district; create a new section of KRS Chapter 95A to establish dissolution protocols for KRS Chapter 75 fire districts that may be initiated in the absence of a KRS 65.166 petition.
Title
AN ACT relating to the provision of fire protection services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 117) |
2016-04-01 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-04-01 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-04-01 | House | received in House |
2016-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | placed in the Consent Orders #1 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | taken from the Consent Orders #2 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2016 (Consent Orders #2) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-25 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 |
2016-02-18 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 22, 2016 |
2016-02-18 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-17 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-02-16 | House | posting waived |
2016-02-08 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2016-02-05 | House | introduced in House |