KY HB343 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-01 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-01 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 341.370 to prohibit disqualification for unemployment benefits for a worker who leaves a job to follow a military spouse who has been reassigned to another military base or duty location that is 100 miles or more from the worker’s home.
Title
AN ACT relating to unemployment compensation.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Moore [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-02-25 | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed | |
2011-02-25 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-24 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2011-02-23 | posting waived | |
2011-02-23 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-07 | to Labor & Industry (H) | |
2011-02-04 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB343.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB343/bill.doc |