KY HB342 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-14 - returned to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-14 - returned to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 133.220 to allow collection of property taxes to begin October 1 of each year instead of the current requirement of September 15; amend KRS 138.210 to define terms related to gasoline; amend KRS 141.390 to add provisions for how pass-through entities apply or distribute the recycling and composting tax credit; amend KRS 141.428 to establish a filing deadline for the clean coal tax credit; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to taxation and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Sannie Overly [D] | Rep. Rick Rand [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | returned to Rules | |
2010-04-14 | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day | |
2010-04-14 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, April 14, 2010 | |
2010-04-14 | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill | |
2010-03-25 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2010-03-25 | 2nd reading | |
2010-03-25 | taken from committee | |
2010-03-24 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2010-03-24 | 1st reading | |
2010-03-24 | taken from committee | |
2010-02-22 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2010-02-18 | received in Senate | |
2010-02-17 | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 | |
2010-02-10 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 17, 2010 | |
2010-02-10 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-09 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-02-05 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-01 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2010-01-28 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB342.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB342/bill.doc |