KY HB339 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate moneys to the Behavioral Health, Developmental and Intellectual Disabilities budget unit, within the Cabinet for Health and Family Services, to provide inpatient psychiatric services within Hospital District IV; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to fiscal matters providing funding for inpatient psychiatric services and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Fugate [R] | Rep. Jason Petrie [R] | Rep. Danny Bentley [R] | Rep. John Blanton [R] |
Rep. Adam Bowling [R] | Rep. Derek Lewis [R] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Brandon Reed [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 89 (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 36) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-02-03 | House | 3rd reading, passed 63-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-02-02 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 03, 2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-01-24 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-01-20 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-20 | House | introduced in House |