KY HB339 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 044)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 044)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 24A.140, 29A.180, and 61.900 to remove references to "city marshal"; amend KRS 57.285, relating to local printing of materials, to remove reference to "city"; amend KRS 65.710, relating to ambulance service contracts, to include all legislative bodies in the various forms of city governance; amend KRS 65.805, relating to nontaxing special districts, to remove a reference to previously repealed statutes; amend KRS 67.750, relating to the taxation of business, to remove the definition of "city"; amend KRS 67.850, relating to the formation of charter county governments, to specify that the charter county government has the authorities of home rule class cities in lieu of the city of the highest class at formation; amend KRS 67.922, relating to unified local governments, to allow the unified local government to exercise authorities belonging to the various classes of cities which may be a part of it; amend KRS 80.010, relating to housing authorities, to include the legislative bodies of all forms of city governments within definition of "governing body"; amend KRS 81.005, relating to the classification of cities, to make technical correction; amend KRS 82.082, relating to city home rule, to remove reference to KRS Chapter 95, relating to city fire and police, and KRS Chapter 96, relating to city utilities; amend KRS 92.281, relating to city license fees, to remove the restriction of cities with populations of less than 1,000 from being able to levy license fees on businesses, trades, occupations, or professions at a percentage basis; amend KRS 95.761, relating to pension plans and civil service plans in cities with populations of 1,000 to 7,999 to make technical changes, to clarify authorizations of cities eligible to provide retirement plans pursuant to KRS 90.400 or 90.410, and to stipulate that no city shall adopt any civil service system during November or December of any even-numbered year; amend KRS 96.045, relating to the rights of utilities in existence in cities, to redefine "municipality" as any county, city of any class, or municipal corporation; amend KRS 96.060, relating to city grants of rights-of-way to utilities, to stipulate that cities have supervising control over the use of their streets, alleys, and other public grounds, to remove population range from a reference to city, and to stipulate that the grant of rights-of-way, in addition to the presently enumerated utilities, subject other utilities to that grant; provide that cities regulate streetcars, and can exercise control over railroad companies' crossings while fixing penalties for violations regarding streetcars and railroad crossings; preserve the rights of property owners whose property abuts a street on which a railroad is granted a right-of-way when there is damage caused by the railroad to the owner's property; amend KRS 96.120 to stipulate that cities that own and operate their own water or light plants can acquire a franchise to furnish water and light to other cities, allow cities that own and operate their own water or light plants to contract with other cities to provide those services to the other cities, and allow any city to install the necessary conveyance infrastructure to receive water and light services from another city; amend KRS 96.189 to allow any city, rather than cities with a certain population, to acquire streetcar systems; amend KRS 96.200 to make technical correction; amend KRS 107.020, 107.030, 107.140, and 107.190, relating to fire hydrant controls, to remove city population restrictions; amend KRS 154.1-010, relating to economic development, to remove "village" and "township" from definition of "municipality"; amend KRS 281.765, relating to the general provisions of motor carriers, to remove a reference to city marshals; amend KRS 146.280, 177.230, 177.240, 177.270, 177.280, 177.290, 262.180, 267.130, and 353.610 to remove the term "village" and, when in the context of incorporation, "town"; amend KRS 95.010 to conform; repeal KRS 79.010, 79.020, 79.030, 79.040, 79.050, 79.060, 96.130, 96.140, 96.330, 96.340, 79.070, 81A.480, 82.088, 95.505, 95.630, and 96.070.
Title
AN ACT relating to cities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 933 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 163 (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 163 (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 044) |
2019-03-12 | House | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-07 | House | received in House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2019-03-05 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-03-05 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-2 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-15 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-14 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2019-02-13 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Charter County Government
Cities
Courts, Circuit
Courts, District
Economic Development
Environment and Conservation
Fire Prevention
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Home Rule
Housing, Building, and Construction
Licensing
Oil and Natural Gas
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Public Health
Public Records and Reports
Public Utilities
Railroads
Special Districts
Taxation
Technical Corrections
Transportation
Unified Local Governments
Cities
Courts, Circuit
Courts, District
Economic Development
Environment and Conservation
Fire Prevention
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Home Rule
Housing, Building, and Construction
Licensing
Oil and Natural Gas
Peace Officers and Law Enforcement
Public Health
Public Records and Reports
Public Utilities
Railroads
Special Districts
Taxation
Technical Corrections
Transportation
Unified Local Governments