KY HB329 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 41)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 41)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 292.991 to specify felony charges for violations of KRS 292.320 based on the amount of the fraud; amend criminal penalties for general violation provisions of KRS Chapter 292 to include only violations of KRS 292.330, 292.332, 292.240, 292.440, 292.450, or 292.500.
Title
AN ACT relating to securities fraud.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 41) |
2017-03-08 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-08 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-07 | House | received in House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 7, 2017 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-23 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 98-0 |
2017-02-16 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 21, 2017 |
2017-02-16 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-15 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-14 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-14 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2017-02-13 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB329.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/17RS/HB329/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/17RS/HB329/vote_history.pdf |