KY HB328 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 44)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 44)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 177.830 to redefine "advertising device" and define "compensation"; amend KRS 177.841 to establish that the section does not apply to directional or other official signs; amend KRS 177.860 to set forth devices that are not a violation; amend KRS 177.863 relating to on-premise advertising; EMERGENCY
Title
AN ACT relating to advertising devices and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. DJ Johnson [R] | Rep. Derek Lewis [R] | Rep. Shawn McPherson [R] | Rep. Steve Sheldon [R] |
Rep. Nancy Tate [R] | Rep. Walker Thomas [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 364 (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa3 sfa6 RSN# 1777 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 77 (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa3 sfa6 RSN# 1777 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 77 (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 44) |
2021-03-16 | House | delivered to Governor |
2021-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-03-16 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-03-16 | House | passed 91-3 |
2021-03-16 | House | House concurred in Senate floor amendments (3) and (6) |
2021-03-16 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendments (3) and (6) |
2021-03-16 | House | taken from Rules |
2021-03-16 | House | to Rules (H) |
2021-03-16 | House | received in House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | passed 30-6 with floor amendments (3) and (6) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | floor amendments (1), (2), (4), and (5) withdrawn |
2021-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | floor amendment (6) filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2021-03-12 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2021-03-11 | Senate | floor amendments (2), (3), (4) and (5) filed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 12, 2021 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-03-03 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-02-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-2 with Committee Substitute |
2021-02-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 11, 2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-02-09 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2021-02-04 | House | posted in committee |
2021-02-04 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-02-02 | House | introduced in House |