KY HB326 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-8)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 2 to designate the Honor and Remember flag as the state's emblem of the service and sacrifice of the brave men and women of the United States Armed Forces who have given their lives in the line of duty; specify locations, dates, and circumstances under which the flag may be displayed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the Honor and Remember flag.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 151 (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-03Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2022-02-22Senateto Committee on Committees (S)
2022-02-22Senatereceived in Senate
2022-02-18House3rd reading, passed 82-0
2022-02-16Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 17, 2022
2022-02-16House2nd reading, to Rules
2022-02-15Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2022-02-11Houseto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (H)
2022-01-19Houseto Committee on Committees (H)
2022-01-19Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback