KY HB325 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of Subtitle 17C of KRS Chapter 304 to define "covered services" and "dental plan"; provide that a dental plan shall not require a participating dentist to provide noncovered services at a fee set by or subject to the dental plan; provide that a third-party administrator for a dental plan shall not make available any providers in its dentist network that sets dental fees for any noncovered services; provide that the penalties in KRS 304.99-010 shall apply to any violation of this section.
Title
AN ACT relating to dental care benefit plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-02-17 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 18, 2011 | |
2011-02-17 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-16 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2011-02-10 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-04 | to Banking & Insurance (H) | |
2011-02-03 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB325.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB325/bill.doc |