KY HB325 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-11)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - received in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - received in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 65 to define "public entity" as any organization that represents a statewide association of local government, whose members are city or county governments, and in which a majority of the governing body are mayors, county judges/executive, or other elected officials; define "affiliated organization" as any incorporated or unincorporated organization staffed, managed, or administered by a public entity; establish fiduciary and internal operations requirements for public entities; require entities and affiliated organizations to adopt a code of ethics and set minimum requirements for the code; require that public entities and affiliated organizations comply with open records and meeting laws; require a public entity and affiliated organization to employ a CPA or the Auditor of Public Accounts to perform a required audit; specify requirements for the audit conducted by a CPA; set powers of the Auditor of Public Accounts relative to auditing public entities.
Title
AN ACT relating to entities that represent a statewide association of local governments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | received in Senate | |
2010-04-14 | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendments (1-title) and (2) | |
2010-04-14 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, committee amendments (1-title) and (2) | |
2010-04-14 | taken from Rules Committee | |
2010-04-01 | to Rules (H) | |
2010-04-01 | received in House | |
2010-04-01 | passed 33-3 with Committee Substitute, committee amendments (1-title) and (2) | |
2010-04-01 | floor amendment (1) withdrawn | |
2010-04-01 | 3rd reading | |
2010-04-01 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, April 1, 2010 | |
2010-04-01 | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent bill with Committee Substitute, committee amendments (1-title) and (2) | |
2010-04-01 | recommitted to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-04-01 | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2010-03-29 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2010-03-29 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 29, 2010 | |
2010-03-25 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2010-03-25 | reported favorably, to Rules | |
2010-03-23 | returned to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-03-23 | 2nd reading | |
2010-03-23 | taken from committee | |
2010-03-19 | returned to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-03-19 | 1st reading | |
2010-03-19 | taken from committee | |
2010-02-18 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-02-16 | received in Senate | |
2010-02-12 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2010-02-11 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 12, 2010 | |
2010-02-11 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-10 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-02-01 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-28 | to Local Government (H) | |
2010-01-26 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB325.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB325/bill.doc |