KY HB324 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
Pending: Senate Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 42.0146 to allow certification as a disabled veteran-owned business by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs Center for Verification and Evaluation to meet the criteria of veteran eligibility, ownership, and control.
Title
AN ACT relating to business opportunities for United States military members and veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Moore [R] | Rep. Nancy Tate [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 150 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2019-02-25 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 26, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-14 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-13 | House | to Small Business & Information Technology (H) |
2019-02-12 | House | introduced in House |