KY HB32 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-07 - to State & Local Government (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 117 to allow minors 16 years of age or older to be appointed as student election assistants; amend KRS 117.045 to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to student assistants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2016-03-04Senatereceived in Senate
2016-03-03House3rd reading, passed 90-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2016-03-02Housetaken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
2016-03-01Houseplaced in the Consent Orders of the Day forThursday, March 3, 2016
2016-03-01Housetaken from Rules
2016-03-01House2nd reading, to Rules
2016-02-29Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2016-02-18Houseposted in committee
2016-01-05Houseto Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2016-01-05Houseintroduced in House
2015-08-14HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback