KY HB319 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 58)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 58)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 12 to require each administrative body that issues a license, permit, certificate, or other document required to operate within a business, profession, or other occupation in the Commonwealth to issue within 30 days a license, permit, certificate, or other document to a United States military service member or veteran who is seeking a license, permit, certificate, or other document and currently holds or recently held a valid equivalent license, permit, certificate, or other document issued by another state, the District of Columbia, or any possession or territory of the United States.
Title
AN ACT relating to business opportunities for United States military and veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Moore [R] | Rep. DJ Johnson [R] | Rep. Jody Richards [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 621 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 210 (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 210 (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 58) |
2018-03-27 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-22 | House | received in House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-03-06 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 82-0 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-03-01 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 2, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-28 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitutes (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2018-02-20 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-08 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | introduced in House |