KY HB318 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - floor amendments (2), (3), (4), (5), (6) and (7) filed
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - floor amendments (2), (3), (4), (5), (6) and (7) filed
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 610.030 to require a court referral for truancy cases when there is no improvement within 30 days; require a court-designated worker to make a finding if diversion is failed due to lack of parental cooperation; allow a court to refer cases back to the court-designated worker and order parental cooperation; amend KRS 610.265 to require children charged with serious felony offenses to be detained pending a detention hearing; amend KRS 610.340 to provide that confidentiality does not apply to cases in which a child has admitted to or been adjudicated for a violent felony offense; amend KRS 635.060 to require a juvenile's probationary period to remain open until any violations are resolved, if a violation is pending at the time of completion.
Title
AN ACT relating to juvenile justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 268 (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | floor amendments (2), (3), (4), (5), (6) and (7) filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2022-03-24 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2022-03-24 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2022-03-23 | Senate | reassigned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2022-03-23 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2022-03-23 | Senate | 1st reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 73-19 |
2022-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 11, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-09 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2022-01-19 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-19 | House | introduced in House |