KY HB318 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 2 to designate June 12 as Women Veterans' Day in the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to Women Veterans' Day.

Sponsors

Rep. Patti Minter [D]Rep. Susan Westrom [D]Rep. Kimberly Banta [R]Rep. Danny Bentley [R]
Rep. John Blanton [R]Rep. Tina Bojanowski [D]Rep. Charles Booker [D]Rep. Adam Bowling [R]
Rep. Terri Branham Clark [D]Rep. Kevin Bratcher [R]Rep. Travis Brenda [R]Rep. George Brown [D]
Rep. Thomas Burch [D]Rep. McKenzie Cantrell [D]Rep. Jeffery Donohue [D]Rep. Myron Dossett [R]
Rep. Jim Duplessis [R]Rep. Daniel Elliott [R]Rep. Joseph Fischer [R]Rep. Kelly Flood [D]
Rep. Deanna Frazier [R]Rep. Chris Freeland [R]Rep. Alan Gentry [D]Rep. James Glenn [D]
Rep. Jim Gooch [R]Rep. Derrick Graham [D]Rep. Joe Graviss [D]Rep. Chris Harris [D]
Rep. Mark Hart [R]Rep. Angie Hatton [D]Rep. Richard Heath [R]Rep. Samara Heavrin [R]
Rep. Kathy Hinkle [D]Rep. Cluster Howard [D]Rep. Regina Huff [R]Rep. Thomas Huff [R]
Rep. Joni Jenkins [D]Rep. Matthew Koch [R]Rep. Adam Koenig [R]Rep. Nima Kulkarni [D]
Rep. Derek Lewis [R]Rep. Scott Lewis [R]Rep. Mary Marzian [D]Rep. Ed Massey [R]
Rep. Bobby McCool [R]Rep. Reginald Meeks [D]Rep. Michael Meredith [R]Rep. Russ Meyer [D]
Rep. Charles Miller [D]Rep. Jerry Miller [R]Rep. Jason Nemes [R]Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D]
Rep. Melinda Prunty [R]Rep. Rick Rand [D]Rep. Josie Raymond [D]Rep. Steve Riley [R]
Rep. Rachel Roberts [D]Rep. Bart Rowland [R]Rep. Sal Santoro [R]Rep. Dean Schamore [D]
Rep. Attica Scott [D]Rep. Steve Sheldon [R]Rep. John Sims [D]Rep. Maria Sorolis [D]
Rep. Cherlynn Stevenson [D]Rep. Wilson Stone [D]Rep. Ashley Tackett Laferty [D]Rep. Nancy Tate [R]
Rep. Walker Thomas [R]Rep. James Tipton [R]Rep. Tommy Turner [R]Rep. Russell Webber [R]
Rep. Buddy Wheatley [D]Rep. Robert Wiederstein [D]Rep. Lisa Willner [D]Rep. Les Yates [R]

Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - House - House: For Consent RCS# 290 (Y: 74 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2020-03-19Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-19House3rd reading, passed 74-10
2020-03-18Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020
2020-03-18Housereturned to Rules
2020-03-18Housetaken from Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H)
2020-03-02Houseposted in committee
2020-02-24Houserecommitted to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H)
2020-02-07House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-06Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-02-04Houseposted in committee
2020-01-27Houseto State Government (H)
2020-01-23Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback