KY HB317 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 176 directing the Department of Highways to display the United States flag, the Kentucky flag, and the POW/MIA flag at all highway rest areas.
Title
AN ACT relating to highway rest areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | signed by Governor | |
2011-03-03 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-03-03 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2011-03-03 | received in House | |
2011-03-02 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 | |
2011-03-02 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 2, 2011 | |
2011-02-25 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-24 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-15 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | |
2011-02-11 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-11 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 | |
2011-02-10 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 11, 2011 | |
2011-02-10 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-09 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-04 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-03 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) | |
2011-02-02 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB317.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB317/bill.doc |