KY HB315 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 63)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 63)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 243.0305 to remove the restriction of the hours of sale for a souvenir retail liquor license; amend KRS 243.040 to create a souvenir retail malt beverage license; amend KRS 243.150 to allow brewers to serve samples on its premises in amounts not to exceed 16 ounces per patron per day; create a new section of KRS Chapter 243 to limit souvenir retail malt beverage licenses to brewers in wet territories, to allow brewers with a souvenir retail malt beverage license to sell no more than 48 ounces per visitor per day, and to prohibit a distributor from restricting the sale of souvenir packages to the licensee only.
Title
AN ACT relating to alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 63) |
2013-03-11 | House | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-11 | House | received in House |
2013-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 28-8 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2013-03-06 | Senate | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2013-03-05 | Senate | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2013-03-04 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 67-26 with Committee Substitute |
2013-02-25 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2013-02-22 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2) filed |
2013-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 26, 2013 |
2013-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2013-02-15 | House | posted in committee |
2013-02-12 | House | to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2013-02-11 | House | introduced in House |