KY HB314 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 8)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 8)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 12.020, 224.20-320, 336.015, 338.015, and 338.061 to abolish the Kentucky Occupational Safety and Health Board and give the Labor Cabinet secretary the board's authority; give the Labor Cabinet secretary authority to suspend or delay administrative regulations based on the actions of the federal government relating to a corresponding federal regulation; repeal KRS 338.051; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Occupational Safety and Health Standards Board and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 192 (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 468 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 117 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 468 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 117 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 8) |
2018-03-01 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-01 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-01 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-02-28 | House | passed 93-1 |
2018-02-28 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2018-02-28 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2018-02-28 | House | taken from Rules |
2018-02-27 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | received in House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-02-12 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 with committee amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2018-02-09 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 12, 2018 |
2018-02-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2018-02-07 | House | posting waived |
2018-02-07 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2018-02-06 | House | introduced in House |