KY HB311 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 455 to promote felony mediation as a way to resolve felony criminal cases.
Title
AN ACT relating to felony mediation.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2260 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 201 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 201 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-29 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | to Rules (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | received in House |
2022-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-1 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 29, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-24 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) |
2022-03-01 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-02-24 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-17 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-16 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-01-25 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2022-01-18 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-18 | House | introduced in House |