KY HB301 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 23)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 23)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 45A to require all costs and expenses related to election administration be paid for with public funds; prohibit a state governmental body employee from accepting anything of value to assist with election administration unless entered into as a lawful contract; create a new section of KRS Chapter 65 to require all costs and expenses related to election administration be paid for with public funds; prohibit a local governmental body employee from accepting anything of value to assist with election administration unless entered into as a lawful contract; require a local governmental body employee to disclose, in writing and within five days, to the Governor and the General Assembly any communication related to election laws and election administration from a federal executive branch agency; create a new section of KRS Chapter 117 to require any governmental body employee to disclose, in writing and within five days, to the Governor and the General Assembly any communication related to election laws and election administration from a federal executive branch agency; amend KRS 116.045 to prohibit a county clerk or local governmental body employee from accepting any private monetary funds to assist with voter registration activities unless accepted as part of a valid contract; amend KRS 117.015 to prohibit the State Board of Elections from accepting any private monetary funds for election administration unless accepted as part of a valid contract; amend KRS 117.995 to prescribed criminal penalties for local and state governmental employees who fail to properly disclose communication from a federal executive branch agency and employees who accept a private contribution or anything of value to assist with election administration unless part of a valid contract; amend KRS 48.630 to prohibit unbudgeted federal appropriations for expenditures related to election administration; and provide that the act may be cited as the "Stop Outside Influence Over Elections Act of 2022."
Title
AN ACT relating to elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Flannery [R] | Rep. Jennifer Henson Decker [R] | Rep. Jim Gooch [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
Rep. Bobby McCool [R] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] | Rep. Nancy Tate [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 253 (Y: 77 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 RSN# 2098 (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 144 (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa1 RSN# 2098 (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 144 (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 23) |
2022-03-11 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-10 | House | passed 77-18 |
2022-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate Floor Amendment (1) |
2022-03-09 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendment (1) |
2022-03-09 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2022-03-08 | House | to Rules (H) |
2022-03-08 | House | received in House |
2022-03-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 27-4 with Floor Amendment (1) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 07, 2022 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-02-22 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-02-17 | House | 3rd reading, passed 75-22 with Committee Substitute (1) and Floor Amendment (1) |
2022-02-15 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 16, 2022 |
2022-02-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-11 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-02-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-02-01 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2022-01-13 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-13 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Corrections Impact
County Clerks
Crimes and Punishments
Elections and Voting
General Assembly
Governor
Local Government
Local Mandate
Secretary of State
Short Titles and Popular Names
State Agencies
State Employees
County Clerks
Crimes and Punishments
Elections and Voting
General Assembly
Governor
Local Government
Local Mandate
Secretary of State
Short Titles and Popular Names
State Agencies
State Employees