KY HB301 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-14 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 159.010 to require students entering the 9th grade after July 1, 2014 to attend school until their 17th birthday or receive a high school diploma; to require students entering the 9th grade after July 1, 2015 to attend school until their 18th birthday or receive a high school diploma; to continue dropout conferences for students between the ages of 17 and 18 until July 1, 2015 school year; to make technical corrections; amend KRS 159.020 to conform; amend KRS 158.146 to remove priority of awarding dropout prevention grants to districts with 3 year average dropout rate exceeding 5%; remove provision directing 75% of funds to elementary and middle schools and 25% to high schools; add use of funds to support statewide strategies and grants to districts to support replicable promising practices; encourage General Assembly to consider increasing funding to support dropout prevention programming if funds become available.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to compulsory school attendance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-14 recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2010-04-14 returned to the Orders of the Day
2010-04-14 returned to Rules (S)
2010-04-14 taken from the Regular Orders of the Day
2010-04-01 passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2010-03-29 passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2010-03-25 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 29. 2010
2010-03-23 reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
2010-03-18 returned to Education (S)
2010-03-18 1st reading
2010-03-18 taken from committee
2010-03-09 to Education (S)
2010-03-05 received in Senate
2010-03-04 3rd reading, passed 94-6 with Committee Substitute, committee amendments (1) and (2-title), floor amendment (1)
2010-03-03 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 4, 2010
2010-03-02 floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2010-03-02 reported favorably, to Rules
2010-02-26 posted in committee
2010-02-22 recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2010-02-18 floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2010-02-17 2nd reading, to Rules
2010-02-16 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendments (1) and (2-title)
2010-01-28 posted in committee
2010-01-21 to Education (H)
2010-01-20 introduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback