KY HB300 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 11A.010, relating to executive branch ethics, to expand and update the definitions of "officer" and "public servant."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to executive branch ethics.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-21 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 162 (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-23Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2018-02-22Senatereceived in Senate
2018-02-21House3rd reading, passed 85-9 with Committee Substitute
2018-02-20Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 21, 2018
2018-02-16House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-15Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-02-13Houseposted in committee
2018-02-06Houseto State Government (H)
2018-02-02Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback