KY HB30 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 53)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 53)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 156.095 to require two hours of in-person suicide prevention professional development training every other school year for middle and high school principals, guidance counselors, and teachers; require a newly hired staff member to receive a packet of information on suicide prevention when the person is hired in a year training is not provided; amend KRS 158.070 to delete requirement for two hours of self-study review for suicide prevention training.
Title
AN ACT relating to suicide prevention training.
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Huff [R] | Rep. Ken Fleming [R] | Rep. David Hale [R] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] |
Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] | Rep. John Sims [D] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] | Rep. Jill York [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 626 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 407 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 80 (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 407 (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 80 (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 53) |
2018-03-27 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-22 | House | passed 90-0 |
2018-03-22 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute |
2018-03-22 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute |
2018-03-22 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2018-03-22 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-03-22 | House | received in House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-1 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-20 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-02-01 | House | 3rd reading, passed 88-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2018-01-26 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 29, 2018 |
2018-01-24 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2018-01-24 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-01-18 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-02 | House | to Education (H) |
2018-01-02 | House | introduced in House |
2017-07-25 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |