KY HB299 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 116)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 197.010 and 197.045 to allow sentencing credits for life skills programs and promising practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to sentencing credits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1025 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 116 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 116)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Housereceived in House
2019-03-14Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2019-03-13Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2019-03-12Senatepassed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day
2019-03-12Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2019
2019-03-07Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill
2019-03-06Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2019-03-06Senate1st reading
2019-03-06Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2019-02-27Senateto Judiciary (S)
2019-02-25Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-22House3rd reading, passed 95-0
2019-02-21Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 22, 2019
2019-02-21House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-20Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2019-02-15Houseposted in committee
2019-02-12Houseto Judiciary (H)
2019-02-11Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback