KY HB298 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 531.335 to raise the penalty for possession or viewing of matter portraying a sexual performance by a minor under the age of 12 years to a Class C felony; amend KRS 531.340 to raise the penalty for the distribution of matter portraying a sexual performance of a minor under the age of 12 years to a Class C felony for the first offense and a Class B for each subsequent offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the sexual exploitation of minors.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-21House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-20Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-15Houseposted in committee
2019-02-12Houseto Judiciary (H)
2019-02-11Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback