KY HB296 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-22 - to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 216B.020 to exempt private offices, clinics, and office buildings of advanced practice registered nurses from certificate of need; amend KRS 311.271 to include advanced practice registered nursing as part of the defined term "healing art"; amend KRS 311B.020 to include advanced practice registered nursing as part of the defined term "licensed practitioner"; amend KRS 438.065 to establish requirements for advanced practice registered nursing related to advertising or soliciting by practitioners of the healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to advanced practice registered nurses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-22Senateto Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
2016-02-19Senatereceived in Senate
2016-02-18House3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2016-02-16Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 18, 2016
2016-02-12House2nd reading, to Rules
2016-02-11Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2016-02-04Houseposted in committee
2016-01-26Houseto Health & Welfare (H)
2016-01-25Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback