KY HB296 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - recommitted to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
Pending: House Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 117.315 to delete the word "certified" relating to challengers and to require the State Board of Elections to promulgate administrative regulations regarding the training of challengers; amend KRS 424.290 to remove the requirement that an entire ballot must be printed in a newspaper before a primary, special or regular election and instead require that the names and parties of the candidates for each office and any issues to be voted upon and the Internet address of the county clerk's Web site be printed in a newspaper.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to elections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-23Houserecommitted to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2015-03-23Housetaken from Rules
2015-03-04House2nd reading, to Rules
2015-03-03Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2015-02-26Houseposted in committee
2015-02-05Houseto Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H)
2015-02-04Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback