KY HB296 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-05 - posted in committee
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 138.130 to redefine "other tobacco products" to include moist snuff; amend KRS 138.140 to lower the excise tax rate on other tobacco products to 12.1 percent; amend KRS 138.195 to make technical corrections; EFFECTIVE August 1, 2010.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to smokeless tobacco.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-05 posted in committee
2010-01-21 to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2010-01-20 introduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback