KY HB295 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - to Banking & Insurance (S)
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-03 - to Banking & Insurance (S)
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of subtitle 4 of KRS Chapter 286, granting the commissioner of the Department of Financial Institutions the authority to require filings under this subtitle be filed with the State Regulatory Registry; create a new section of subtitle 9 of KRS Chapter 286, granting the commissioner of the Department of Financial Institutions the authority to require filings under this subtitle be filed with the State Regulatory Registry.
Title
AN ACT relating to improved licensing system process for non-depository financial institutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-26 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-06 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-05 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2015-02-04 | House | introduced in House |