KY HB282 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 110)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 110)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 216 to define and establish registration of health care services agencies; require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to promulgate administrative regulations for registration; require health care services agencies to retain documentation of direct care staff credentials and establish other requirements; require quarterly reports to the cabinet; amend KRS 367.374 to add direct care staff services to emergency price gouging limitations; and amend KRS 45A.690, 216.785, 216.787, 216.789, 216.793, and 216B.020 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to health care services agencies.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Riley [R] | Rep. Adam Bowling [R] | Rep. Regina Huff [R] | Rep. Shawn McPherson [R] |
Rep. Suzanne Miles [R] | Rep. Melinda Prunty [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 400 (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2148 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 125 (Y: 70 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2148 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 125 (Y: 70 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 110) |
2022-03-29 | House | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-25 | House | passed 80-11 |
2022-03-25 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-24 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-17 | House | to Rules (H) |
2022-03-17 | House | received in House |
2022-03-17 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0-1 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 17, 2022 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2022-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-02-17 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-02-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 70-20 |
2022-02-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 14, 2022 |
2022-02-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-02-02 | House | to Health & Family Services (H) |
2022-01-13 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-01-13 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Contracts
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Licensing
Nurses
State Agencies
Contracts
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Licensing
Nurses
State Agencies