KY HB279 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 43)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 154.12-203 to update Kentucky Commission on Military Affairs membership based on current commands, battalions, and military installations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to military affairs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 280 (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1379 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 62 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27Housesigned by Governor (Acts ch. 43)
2020-03-19Housedelivered to Governor
2020-03-19Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-03-19Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-03-19Housepassed 82-0
2020-03-19HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-19Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-19Houseto Rules (H)
2020-03-19Housereceived in House
2020-03-18Senate3rd reading, passed 31-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-18Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 18, 2020
2020-03-17Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-12Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-02-07Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2020-02-05Senatereceived in Senate
2020-02-04House3rd reading, passed 93-0
2020-02-03Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 4, 2020
2020-01-30House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-01-29Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-01-27Houseposted in committee
2020-01-21Houseto Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H)
2020-01-16Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback