KY HB279 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 43)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 43)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 154.12-203 to update Kentucky Commission on Military Affairs membership based on current commands, battalions, and military installations.
Title
AN ACT relating to military affairs.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Tate [R] | Rep. Ed Massey [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 280 (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1379 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 62 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 1379 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 62 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | House | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 43) |
2020-03-19 | House | delivered to Governor |
2020-03-19 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-03-19 | House | passed 82-0 |
2020-03-19 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-19 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-19 | House | to Rules (H) |
2020-03-19 | House | received in House |
2020-03-18 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 18, 2020 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-02-04 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 |
2020-02-03 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 4, 2020 |
2020-01-30 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-29 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-27 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-21 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2020-01-16 | House | introduced in House |